Global Patent Index - EP 0733769 B1

EP 0733769 B1 2000-05-03 - Fire-resistant glazing

Title (en)

Fire-resistant glazing

Title (de)

Brandschutzverglasung

Title (fr)

Vitrage pare-feu

Publication

EP 0733769 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103139 A

Priority

DE 19510309 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733769A2] The glass pane (2) covering the opening is fixed on a profiled support section (3) by a fireproof holder which has a profiled sealing section on inside the room reinforced by a steel element. The profiled sealing section can have sealing lips (12) which are in sealing engagement with the pane. The steel reinforcement elements can be supporting steel inserts (11) incorporated in the sealing section e.g. in the form of a linked band. An additional steel angle (14) can be provided embedded in the sealing section with the base of the angle serving as the supporting face (15) for the associated swelling sealing element (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733769 A2 19960925; EP 0733769 A3 19970205; EP 0733769 B1 20000503; AT 192545 T 20000515; DE 19510309 A1 19960926

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010404

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605094 20000608

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, VON REVY & PARTNER

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2000-05-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192545 T 20000515

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990312

1997-08-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970610

1997-05-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: J. EBERSPAECHER GMBH & CO.

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI