Global Patent Index - EP 0733779 B1

EP 0733779 B1 2002-12-18 - Method and apparatus for cleaning wells by means of ultrasound

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for cleaning wells by means of ultrasound

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Brunnen mit Hilfe von Ultraschall

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour le nettoyage de puits par moyen d'ultrason

Publication

EP 0733779 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101406 A

Priority

DE 19510421 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733779A2] Wells are cleaned by ultrasound, generated by magnetostriction. Pref. the transducer surfaces radiate sound at a power of 8012 W/cm<2>, at frequencies in the range 18-25 kHz, pref. at 20 kHz. The heads are pref. perpendicular to the shaft wall (16) and are excited with longitudinal oscillations and resonance frequencies. A unit consisting of ultrasound transducers and dirty water pump, first cleans a designated region. The unit then is moved vertically for the next cycle, the dirty water being extracted. Pref. the transducer surfaces radiate sound at a power of 8-12 W/cm<2>, at frequencies in the range 18-25 kHz, pref. at 20 kHz. The heads are perpendicular to the shaft wall (16) and are excited with longitudinal oscillations and resonance frequencies.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 37/08; E03B 3/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 1/08 (2006.01); E21B 28/00 (2006.01); E21B 37/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 37/08 (2013.01); B06B 1/08 (2013.01); E21B 28/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733779 A2 19960925; EP 0733779 A3 19971022; EP 0733779 B1 20021218; AT 230062 T 20030115

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2004-04-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040420

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-11-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030627

2003-06-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021218

2003-03-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030201

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609982 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609982 P 20030130

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230062 T 20030115

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991014

1998-06-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980422

1997-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL