Global patent index - EP 0733798 B1

EP 0733798 B1 2000-06-07 - Fuel injection device working according to the solid energy accumulator principle, for internal combustion engines

Title (en)

Fuel injection device working according to the solid energy accumulator principle, for internal combustion engines

Title (de)

Kraftstoff-Einspritzvorrichtung nach dem Festkörper-Energiespeicherprinzip für Brennkraftmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'injection de combustible suivant le principe de l'accumulateur d'énergie solide, pour moteurs à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0733798 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96109438 A

Priority

  • DE 4206817 A
  • EP 93905299 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9318297A1] A fuel injection device works according to the solid energy accumulator principle. A reciprocating piston (10, 14) guided in the cylinder of a reciprocating piston pump (1) driven by an electromagnet (9) delivers portions of the fuel to be injected to the pump area during a practically resistance-free acceleration phase that precedes injection and during which the reciprocating piston (10, 14) accumulates kinetic energy. Fuel delivery is then suddenly stopped by delivery interrupting means (6), so that a pressure shock is generated in the fuel located in a closed pressure chamber, by direct transmission of the accumulated kinetic energy of the reciprocating piston (10, 14) to the fuel located in the pressure chamber. The pressure shock is used to inject fuel through an inection nozzle device (3). The pressure shock generating means that interrupt fuel delivery are located out of the guiding, liquid-tight contact area between the reciprocating piston (10, 14) and the cylinder of the reciprocating piston pump (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 51/04; F02M 63/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/20 (2006.01); F01M 1/02 (2006.01); F02D 33/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/08 (2006.01); F02M 39/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 51/04 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 55/00 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 57/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/38 (2006.01); F02M 61/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/04 (2006.01); F02M 61/08 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01); F02M 63/06 (2006.01); F02M 69/00 (2006.01); F02M 69/24 (2006.01); F02M 69/34 (2006.01); F02M 69/46 (2006.01); F02N 19/00 (2010.01); F04B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 69/462 (2013.01); F01M 1/02 (2013.01); F02D 33/006 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02M 37/0047 (2013.01); F02M 37/08 (2013.01); F02M 39/005 (2013.01); F02M 51/04 (2013.01); F02M 55/00 (2013.01); F02M 55/007 (2013.01); F02M 55/02 (2013.01); F02M 57/02 (2013.01); F02M 57/027 (2013.01); F02M 59/38 (2013.01); F02M 61/047 (2013.01); F02M 61/08 (2013.01); F02M 63/06 (2013.01); F02M 69/24 (2013.01); F02M 69/34 (2013.01); F02M 69/46 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2058 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2075 (2013.01); F02M 2037/085 (2013.01); F02M 2200/24 (2013.01); F02M 2200/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9318297 A1 19930916; AT 140768 T 19960815; AT 146851 T 19970115; AT 154100 T 19970615; AT 169376 T 19980815; AT 193753 T 20000615; AU 3630593 A 19931005; AU 3630793 A 19931005; AU 3630893 A 19931005; AU 3790995 A 19960307; AU 5627396 A 19961003; AU 664739 B2 19951130; AU 667345 B2 19960321; AU 671100 B2 19960815; AU 679648 B2 19970703; AU 681827 B2 19970904; CA 2127799 A1 19930916; CA 2127799 C 19990629; CA 2127800 A1 19930916; CA 2127800 C 19990629; CA 2127801 A1 19930916; CA 2127801 C 19990615; DE 59303326 D1 19960829; DE 59304903 D1 19970206; DE 59306679 D1 19970710; DE 59308851 D1 19980910; DE 59310057 D1 20000713; EP 0629264 A1 19941221; EP 0629264 B1 19960724; EP 0629265 A1 19941221; EP 0629265 B1 19970604; EP 0630442 A1 19941228; EP 0630442 B1 19961227; EP 0725215 A2 19960807; EP 0725215 A3 19960821; EP 0725215 B1 19980805; EP 0733798 A2 19960925; EP 0733798 A3 19961211; EP 0733798 B1 20000607; HK 1013676 A1 20000414; JP 2002089413 A 20020327; JP 2626677 B2 19970702; JP 2626678 B2 19970702; JP 2867334 B2 19990308; JP 3282711 B2 20020520; JP 3330544 B2 20020930; JP H07504475 A 19950518; JP H07504476 A 19950518; JP H07504954 A 19950601; JP H09170519 A 19970630; JP H09177636 A 19970711; JP H11101169 A 19990413; JP H11107883 A 19990420; US 5469828 A 19951128; US 5520154 A 19960528; US 6188561 B1 20010213; WO 9318290 A1 19930916; WO 9318296 A1 19930916

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040304

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FICHT G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-05-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-05-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030310

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020313

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020306

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59310057

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-13

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 629265

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193753

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FICHT GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980512

1996-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT SE

1996-09-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960612

1996-09-25 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 629265

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT SE