Global Patent Index - EP 0733808 B1

EP 0733808 B1 2000-01-12 - Centrifugal pump

Title (en)

Centrifugal pump

Title (de)

Kreiselpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe centrifuge

Publication

EP 0733808 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102054 A

Priority

DE 19510812 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733808A1] The pump has one or more running wheels in its casing and flow guide parts in the region of the through-flow apertures. These parts are in the form of wall projections (6), encompassing two surfaces (A,B) running in the flow direction and merging with the circumferential surface of a through flow aperture (5). The two surfaces (A,B) enclose an angle which is such that the side lines (a,b) of the two surfaces are in a ratio of a/b not more than (1). The side lines, in connection with a part of the circumference of the through-flow aperture, enclose another wall surface (C).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/42; F04D 29/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/4273 (2013.01); F04D 29/445 (2013.01); F04D 29/448 (2013.01); F05B 2240/121 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733808 A1 19960925; EP 0733808 B1 20000112; DE 19510812 A1 19960926

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59604148

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-06-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604148

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990618

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970324

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT