Global Patent Index - EP 0733835 B1

EP 0733835 B1 2000-04-26 - Shut-off device

Title (en)

Shut-off device

Title (de)

Absperrarmatur

Title (fr)

Soupape d'arrêt

Publication

EP 0733835 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102521 A

Priority

DE 19506753 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19506753A1] The inner surface (6) of the profiled elastomeric seal has two sealing lips (7,8) sealing the outside of the slide plate (5). Between the sealing lips is a stable, thermoplastic guide belt containing filler (9) whose inner surface cooperates with the slide plate. The circle-segment-shaped lower outer defining surface (11) of the profiled seal matches the external circle segment shape of the profiled seal interior (2). Under and behind the lower sealing lip (7) is a cavity forming a pressurised chamber (12) together with the slide plate. The lower, outer defining surface (13) of the pressure piece (4) fits tightly on the upper outer surface (14) of the profiled seal. Between the lower (15) and upper (16) inner surface of the profiled seal is a gap (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 3/02; F16J 15/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16K 3/0227 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19506753 A1 19950727; DE 19506753 C2 19980514; AT 192219 T 20000515; EP 0733835 A2 19960925; EP 0733835 A3 19970625; EP 0733835 B1 20000426; ES 2146803 T3 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605021

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030221

2004-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040229

2004-02-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-02-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030221

2003-02-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030211

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-02-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-20 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-02-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020204

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020117

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20010129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146803 T3

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605021 20000531

2000-05-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI LU NL

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192219 T 20000515

1999-08-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SHUT-OFF DEVICE

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981028

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970526

1997-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI LU NL

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI LU NL