Global Patent Index - EP 0733875 B1

EP 0733875 B1 2001-05-30 - Non-lethal munition with an incapacitating effect

Title (en)

Non-lethal munition with an incapacitating effect

Title (de)

Nichtletale Munition mit einem unschädlichmachenden Effekt

Title (fr)

Munition non létale notamment à effet incapacitant

Publication

EP 0733875 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400608 A

Priority

FR 9503423 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733875A1] The missile (100) consists of a body (110) with an inner container (130) of a pressurised gas, and has a nose (140) with a percussion pin to pierce the gas container on impact. The body (110) is located inside a shell (50), and either gas container or percussion; nose is mounted on a slider (120), and the body has stops (117) to prevent the slider moving towards the nose. The gas container can incorporate a separate active agent, e.g. a paint, and the missile's outer body (110) has apertures (170) in it to allow the gas/paint to escape on impact. The nose (140) of the missile can be made from rubber or silicone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733875 A1 19960925; EP 0733875 B1 20010530; DE 69613034 D1 20010705; DE 69613034 T2 20020214; ES 2157406 T3 20010816; FR 2732105 A1 19960927; FR 2732105 B1 19970620

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070322

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. ETIENNE *LACROIX - TOUS ARTIFICES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060323

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060322

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060323

2006-03-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060322

2005-03-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050323

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050309

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2157406 T3

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69613034 20010705

2001-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CON LOR S.R.L.

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970324

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI