Global Patent Index - EP 0733955 B1

EP 0733955 B1 2000-02-16 - Electrophotographic recording material for the production of printing plates

Title (en)

Electrophotographic recording material for the production of printing plates

Title (de)

Elektrophotographisches Aufzeichnungsmaterial für die Herstellung von Druckplatten

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement électrophotographique pour la fabrication de plaques d'impression

Publication

EP 0733955 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104124 A

Priority

DE 19510526 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0733955A1] The binder used in an electrophotographic recording material comprising an electrically conductive carrier and an aq. alkali soln.-delaminable photosensitive layer comprising an organic photoconductor, a sensitiser and a binder is a mixt. of (a) a copolymer with vinyl aromatic units and maleic anhydride (and/or partial ester) units; and (b) a copolymer with vinyl aromatic and (meth)acrylic acid units.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 5/05; G03G 13/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 5/05 (2006.01); G03G 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 13/283 (2013.01); G03G 5/0535 (2013.01); G03G 5/0546 (2013.01); G03G 13/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0733955 A1 19960925; EP 0733955 B1 20000216; DE 19510526 A1 19960926; JP H0922127 A 19970121; US 5744272 A 19980428

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-11-06 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-03-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010312

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-05 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 04/2000: PATENTNUMBER 0733955 SHOULD BE DELETED (SEE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 05.04.2000/14).

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-04-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604448 20000323

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT AG

1997-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970429

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970325

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL