Global Patent Index - EP 0734040 B1

EP 0734040 B1 2001-12-19 - Apparatus for connecting vacuum pump frames to electron tubes

Title (en)

Apparatus for connecting vacuum pump frames to electron tubes

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Verbinden von Vakuumpumpständen mit Elektronenröhren

Title (fr)

Appareil pour connecter des bâtis de pompe à vide aux tubes à électrons

Publication

EP 0734040 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103541 A

Priority

DE 19510727 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734040A1] The connection appts. connects a suction joint (1) of a vacuum pumping installation to the neck (10) of the tube in a jig with lateral guidance rollers (4) running on rails (6) whose profile causes levers (5) to be pivoted slightly outwards against compression springs (9). This movement varies the spacing between centring rollers (8) which guide the evacuation stem (11) of the tube safely into the sealing ring (13) of the suction joint. At the same time spring contacts (15) in a holder (16) are brought up to connections (12) with the tube cathode until contact is made with the roller (18) of a release unit (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/385

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/385 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/385 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734040 A1 19960925; EP 0734040 B1 20011219; AT 211302 T 20020115; BR 9601075 A 19980106; CN 1137163 A 19961204; DE 19510727 A1 19960926; JP H08273545 A 19961018; MX PA96001080 A 20050714; TW 416570 U 20001221; US 5797782 A 19980825

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-10-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-06-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020307

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608474 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-12-19 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211302 T 20020115

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970303

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL