Global Patent Index - EP 0734043 B1

EP 0734043 B1 2000-05-31 - Double-gated flat display screen

Title (en)

Double-gated flat display screen

Title (de)

Doppel-Gate-Flaches Bildschirm

Title (fr)

Ecran plat de visualisation a double grille

Publication

EP 0734043 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96410030 A

Priority

FR 9503570 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734043A1] The screen has cathodes (1) organised in columns (28) to bombard a phosphor anode. The rows (21) of a first grid (20) are addressed sequentially during a period when the combs (24,25) of a second grid (23) are addressed alternately to form an interlaced image. The cathode columns are addressed simultaneously with each row at a potential to determine the brightness for a pixel defined by the comb addressed within the current row. The bias potential on the combs is chosen so that the electrons emitted by the cathode directly below the comb tracks (26,27) are such that the unaddressed tracks collect the electrons. The focusing potential for a track is greater than that of the unaddressed rows of the first grid while that of the collector is less. Three such assemblies are used to provide a colour display.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 31/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/22 (2006.01); H01J 29/46 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/46 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734043 A1 19960925; EP 0734043 B1 20000531; DE 69608598 D1 20000706; DE 69608598 T2 20010208; FR 2732159 A1 19960927; FR 2732159 B1 19970613; JP H08293273 A 19961105; US 5764204 A 19980609

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040321

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040321

2003-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030916

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-07-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIXTECH S.A.

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608598 20000706

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990705

1998-12-09 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970305

1996-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT