Global Patent Index - EP 0734433 B1

EP 0734433 B1 2000-03-22 - VISCOSITY STABLE CONCENTRATED LIQUID FABRIC SOFTENER COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

VISCOSITY STABLE CONCENTRATED LIQUID FABRIC SOFTENER COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

VISKOSITÄTSSTABILE KONZENTRIERTE WEICHSPÜLERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ASSOUPLISSANTES CONCENTREES LIQUIDES, DE VISCOSITE STABLE

Publication

EP 0734433 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95904876 A

Priority

  • US 9414255 W
  • US 16611393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9516766A1] Viscosity stable, concentrated, aqueous, liquid fabric softening compositions contain a mixture of biodegradable diester quaternary ammonium softening materials and specific co-active fabric softening materials which include substituted imidazoline compounds and specific quaternary ammonium salts. The compositions have superior stability at both normal and lower temperatures. The best process for preparing such compositions uses a molten premix of the fabric softening materials which is dispersed in an aqueous phase through the use of high shear milling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/645; C11D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06M 13/46 (2006.01); C11D 1/645 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); D06M 13/02 (2006.01); D06M 13/322 (2006.01); D06M 13/463 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0015 (2013.01); C11D 1/645 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9516766 A1 19950622; BR 9408310 A 19970826; CA 2179007 A1 19950622; CA 2179007 C 20020402; CN 1142847 A 19970212; CN 1161450 C 20040811; DE 69423650 D1 20000427; DE 69423650 T2 20001102; DE 69423650 T3 20041118; EP 0734433 A1 19961002; EP 0734433 B1 20000322; EP 0734433 B2 20040324; ES 2144603 T3 20000616; ES 2144603 T5 20041116; JP 3746294 B2 20060215; JP H09506684 A 19970630; MA 23394 A1 19950701

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141213

2015-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150226

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141211

2014-12-31 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20141211

2014-12-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69423650

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131230

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-12-31 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2004-11-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2004-03-24 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: UNILEVER PLC

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-02-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144603 T3

2000-05-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423650 20000427

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-10-13 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1997-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19961213

1996-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960528

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB