Global Patent Index - EP 0734671 B1

EP 0734671 B1 2000-11-29 - Baby carrier

Title (en)

Baby carrier

Title (de)

Kindertrage

Title (fr)

Porte-bébé

Publication

EP 0734671 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420087 A

Priority

FR 9503998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734671A1] The carrier has support (1) to be strapped on by the user and has, on its front face, a latch frame (5). An independent base (7) engages a ventral section of the carrier and a dorsal section which each receive a female section (6) which can be brought into engagement with the latch frame to assure retention of the base w.r.t. the support and allow reversal of the base if required. The front face of the carrier can receive a vertical strip to receive the latching frame. The latter has a rigid support of extended length.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47D 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47D 13/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734671 A1 19961002; EP 0734671 B1 20001129; DE 69611050 D1 20010104; ES 2153552 T3 20010301; FR 2732204 A1 19961004; FR 2732204 B1 19970606

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160316

2016-06-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160624

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153552

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010301

2001-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611050

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-04

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT PT

2000-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001129

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUTCHINSON S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981026

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970310

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES IT PT