Global Patent Index - EP 0734772 B1

EP 0734772 B1 2001-05-30 - Filter for use in electrostatic type dust collector and method of manufacturing the same

Title (en)

Filter for use in electrostatic type dust collector and method of manufacturing the same

Title (de)

Filter zur Verwendung in einem elektrostatischen Staubsammler und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Filtre pour l'utilisation dans un collecteur de poussière du type électrostatique et méthode de fabrication de celui-ci

Publication

EP 0734772 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96301915 A

Priority

JP 9774995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734772A1] A filter for use in an electrostatic type dust collector including a flexible sheet-like filtering member pleated into a corrugated configuration in such a manner that alternating crest lines face toward an upstream side of a dust containing gas flow and the remaining alternating crest lines face a downstream side of the gas flow, a first set of electrically conductive or insulating spacers provided between successive facets of an upstream side of the filtering member, and a second set of electrically conductive spacers provided between successive facets of a downstream side surface of the filtering member. The electrically insulating and conductive spacers serve to connect successive facets to each other with keeping a given distance therebetween, and the electrically conductive spacers also serve as electric conductors for applying an electric field. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 3/155

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/155 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 3/155 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734772 A1 19961002; EP 0734772 B1 20010530; CN 1120054 C 20030903; CN 1137947 A 19961218; DE 69613038 D1 20010705; DE 69613038 T2 20010913; KR 0152159 B1 19981015

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070320

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070320

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69613038 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIDORI ANZEN CO., LTD.

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990722

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970402

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI