Global Patent Index - EP 0734790 B1

EP 0734790 B1 2000-12-20 - Plastic objects sorting machine

Title (en)

Plastic objects sorting machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Sortieren von Plastikgegenständen

Title (fr)

Machine de tri d'objets en plastique

Publication

EP 0734790 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400652 A

Priority

FR 9503924 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734790A1] The sorter consists of a centrifugal separator in two sections - a chamber (2) which is spherical, truncated conical or trunco-spherical in shape, surrounded by a first horizontal peripheral track (3) with an outer rim (5) which has a gap in it, and a second, or sorting, track (8) round the outside of the first. The chamber (2) has a raised centre and is rotated about an axis inclined at 5-30 degrees to the vertical. The articles being sorted, e.g. bottle made from glass or plastics, such as PVC, PET, polyethylene or polypropylene, are scanned by sensors (7) and ejected, e.g. by blowers (10) into different containers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 5/36; B07C 5/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07B 7/083 (2006.01); B07B 9/02 (2006.01); B07C 5/34 (2006.01); B07C 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 5/36 (2013.01); B07C 5/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734790 A1 19961002; EP 0734790 B1 20001220; DE 69611259 D1 20010125; DE 69611259 T2 20010426; ES 2154390 T3 20010401; FR 2732247 A1 19961004; FR 2732247 B1 19970523; JP H0994535 A 19970408

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-12-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-03-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050327

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-11-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INSTITUT REGIONAL DES MATERAUX AVANCES *IRMA

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. *SYDEL

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-04-04 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-01-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-04-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154390 T3

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611259 20010125

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-09-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990816

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970402

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI