Global Patent Index - EP 0734795 B1

EP 0734795 B1 2000-01-26 - Method for feedforward thickness control in rolling of foils

Title (en)

Method for feedforward thickness control in rolling of foils

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Dickenvorsteuerung beim Folienwalzen

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la régulation à action directe d'épaisseur dans le laminage de feuillards

Publication

EP 0734795 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104291 A

Priority

DE 19511801 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734795A1] The process concerns thickness control during foil rolling, by means of characteristic curves of individual parameters (foil tension, rolling speed etc.) stored in a process computer, for various working points, and also in combination with monitor-based control. The entry-side foil thickness deviations are determined and compensated by means of in-advance thickness control. Also claimed is an appts. for implementation of the process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/16; B21B 37/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 1/40 (2006.01); B21B 37/16 (2006.01); B21B 37/18 (2006.01); B21B 37/48 (2006.01); B21B 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/165 (2013.01); B21B 37/48 (2013.01); B21B 1/40 (2013.01); B21B 39/08 (2013.01); B21B 2265/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734795 A1 19961002; EP 0734795 B1 20000126; AT 189140 T 20000215; CA 2173049 A1 19961001; CA 2173049 C 20070612; DE 19511801 A1 19961002; JP 3697313 B2 20050921; JP H08281313 A 19961029; KR 100394489 B1 20031224; US 5771724 A 19980630

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-03-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120319

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120319

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120319

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604264

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 189140 T

- Effective date: 20120319

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120319

2012-10-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121001

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110316

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110314

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-05-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

2000-04-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-04-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604264 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT NL

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189140 T 20000215

1998-06-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980416

1996-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960402

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT NL