Global Patent Index - EP 0734800 B1

EP 0734800 B1 2000-07-12 - Strand guide in a continuous casting plant for thin slabs

Title (en)

Strand guide in a continuous casting plant for thin slabs

Title (de)

Strangführung einer Stranggiessanlage für Dünnbrammen

Title (fr)

Cage de guidage dans une installation à coulée continue de brames minces

Publication

EP 0734800 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103922 A

Priority

DE 19511113 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2171377A1] A billet guiding unit of a continuous casting plant for thin slabs includes guide rolls supported on oppositely located frames, wherein the frames are tensioned relative to each other against stop surfaces by means of tension rods. Hydraulic cylinders for extending or stretching the tension rods are mounted between corresponding stop surfaces of the frames. The distance between oppositely located rows of rolls of the frames are corrected by determining a lower deviation side of the slab by carrying out a continuous measurement of the thickness of the slab sides, by determining from the difference of the dimensions the required extension of the tension rods on the lower deviation side and by applying to the hydraulic cylinders the pressure required for the extension of the tension rods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/128 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19511113 A1 19960926; AT 194529 T 20000715; CA 2171377 A1 19960926; CN 1069242 C 20010808; CN 1137958 A 19961218; EP 0734800 A1 19961002; EP 0734800 B1 20000712; ES 2148614 T3 20001016; IN 193018 B 20040619; JP H08267206 A 19961015; US 5709261 A 19980120

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050313

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030314

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-03-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-03-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030314

2003-03-13 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-03-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-03-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-03-20 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020309

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-08 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-07 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148614 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-09-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605563 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194529 T 20000715

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980630

1996-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960402

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE