Global Patent Index - EP 0734812 B1

EP 0734812 B1 2000-06-14 - Drag finishing device and drag finishing process

Title (en)

Drag finishing device and drag finishing process

Title (de)

Gleitschleifanlage sowie Verfahren zum Gleitschleifen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de finissage par traînage et procédé de finissage par traînage

Publication

EP 0734812 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104948 A

Priority

  • DE 29505491 U
  • DE 29507515 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734812A1] A grinder has a holder for the grinding material and a rotary workpiece carrier. The holder (5) is open upwards to allow the filling or removal of the grinding material. There is an adjuster (3) for the vertical relative movement between the workpiece carrier (13) and this holder so that the workpiece can be immersed in the grinding material. There is a control unit for a rotary movement of the workpiece in this material, defined by the relative vertical positions. The workpiece carrier can rotate about a horizontal or vertical axis. The control unit allows the carrier to rotate by 180 degrees. The grinding material holder has an annular ridge for the end of a sliding rod inside another one (15) protruding from the carrier used for position sensing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 31/00 (2006.01); B24B 31/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 31/10 (2013.01); B24B 31/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734812 A1 19961002; EP 0734812 B1 20000614; AT 193852 T 20000615; CZ 289258 B6 20011212; CZ 9600930 A3 19971015; HU 221526 B 20021128; HU 9600845 A2 19961128; HU 9600845 A3 20000128; HU 9600845 D0 19960528

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040328

2003-03-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605425

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19960328

2000-06-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193852

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991130

1999-10-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DRAG FINISHING DEVICE AND DRAG FINISHING PROCESS

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970121

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1996-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 960328

1996-10-02 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 960328