Global Patent Index - EP 0734930 B1

EP 0734930 B1 2000-05-31 - Aerial transport system with rails

Title (en)

Aerial transport system with rails

Title (de)

Schwebebahn-Transportsystem mit Schienen

Title (fr)

Installation de transport aérien par rail

Publication

EP 0734930 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96810165 A

Priority

CH 88795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734930A1] The overhead transport rail (8) on which a bogie (10) with a suspended cabin (16) runs is supported by pylons (2). The rail is fixed in a carrying structure which is connected to the pylons by ties (6). The carrying structure comprises upper (3) and lower (4) beams connected by cross members (51-54). The bogie rail is fixed on the lower beam. The cabin is pulled by a cable and the ties support two parallel carrying structures (1). The carrying structure also has a safety rail (9), parallel to the bogie rail, fixed under the upper beam. The bogie is provided with rollers (12,13) and guide and safety rollers (14,15)and has a parachute braking system (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61B 3/00; B61B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61B 3/00 (2006.01); B61B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61B 9/00 (2013.01); B61B 3/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734930 A1 19961002; EP 0734930 B1 20000531; AT 193498 T 20000615; CH 690910 A5 20010228; DE 69608602 D1 20000706

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030315

2002-08-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020812

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-08-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020808

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69608602 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193498 T 20000615

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981116

1997-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970306

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT