Global Patent Index - EP 0734964 B1

EP 0734964 B1 2001-12-05 - Packaging arrangement for contact lenses

Title (en)

Packaging arrangement for contact lenses

Title (de)

Verpackung für Kontaktlinsen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'emballage pour lentilles de contact

Publication

EP 0734964 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96302226 A

Priority

US 41451495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0734964A1] A base member (10) for a blister package for the containment of a contact lens includes a planar flange (12) extending outwardly about a cavity (16) for housing the contact lens. Proximate the peripheral edge of the flange, there is formed a continuous groove (24) into which there is pressed the material of a flexible cover sheet of the blister package so as to clampingly engage the base member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/34; A45C 11/00; A61F 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02C 7/04 (2006.01); A45C 11/04 (2006.01); A61L 2/18 (2006.01); B65B 25/00 (2006.01); B65D 75/32 (2006.01); B65D 75/34 (2006.01); B65D 85/38 (2006.01); G02C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 25/008 (2013.01); B65D 75/326 (2013.01); B65D 75/327 (2013.01); B65D 2577/045 (2013.01); B65D 2585/545 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0734964 A1 19961002; EP 0734964 B1 20011205; AT 210056 T 20011215; AU 5039196 A 19961010; AU 704826 B2 19990506; CA 2173099 A1 19961001; CA 2173099 C 20060912; DE 69617505 D1 20020117; DE 69617505 T2 20020718; JP 4030609 B2 20080109; JP H0947312 A 19970218; SG 52616 A1 19980928; TW 377331 B 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-05-04 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160328

2016-04-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160328

2016-03-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69617505

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617505 20020117

2002-01-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210056 T 20011215

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000229

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970310

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE