Global Patent Index - EP 0735128 B1

EP 0735128 B1 2000-08-23 - Extended life rust and oxidation oils

Title (en)

Extended life rust and oxidation oils

Title (de)

Korrosions- und Oxidationsöle mit verlängerter Lebensdauer

Title (fr)

Des huiles de corrosion et d'oxidation à vie prolongée

Publication

EP 0735128 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96302164 A

Priority

US 41303895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735128A2] A lubricant composition comprising a base oil, rust and oxidation inhibitors and (a) a dithiocarbamate of formula (I) <CHEM> wherein R<4> is a hydrocarbylene group having 1 to 10 carbon atoms, the groups R<5> are the same or different and each is hydrogen or a hydrocarbyl group having 1 to 18 carbon atoms, and the groups R<3> are the same or different and each is a hydrocarbyl group having 1 to 18 carbon atoms; and (b) an alkylphenyl- alpha -naphthylamine of formula (II) <CHEM> wherein R<1> and R<2> are the same or different and each is hydrogen or C1 to C18 alkyl.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 141/08; C10M 141/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/08 (2006.01); C10M 141/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 141/10 (2013.01); C10M 141/08 (2013.01); C10M 2207/024 (2013.01); C10M 2207/026 (2013.01); C10M 2207/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/062 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/221 (2013.01); C10M 2215/225 (2013.01); C10M 2215/226 (2013.01); C10M 2215/30 (2013.01); C10M 2219/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2223/02 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/049 (2013.01); C10M 2223/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 141/08 + C10M 133/12 + C10M 135/18
  2. C10M 141/10 + C10M 133/12 + C10M 135/18 + C10M 137/02

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735128 A2 19961002; EP 0735128 A3 19970611; EP 0735128 B1 20000823; CA 2171924 A1 19960929; CA 2171924 C 20070313

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160327

2016-04-20 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160327

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-02-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-19 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE GB

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971030

1997-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971030

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970827

1997-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE GB

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE GB