Global Patent Index - EP 0735167 B1

EP 0735167 B1 2000-07-12 - Combing machine

Title (en)

Combing machine

Title (de)

Kämmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine de peignage

Publication

EP 0735167 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102426 A

Priority

US 41089195 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5546636A] A comber machine with a nipper head (3) has a fixed bearing (2), and at least one pair of detaching rolls (6'') which are rotatably mounted in bearings (41). The nipper head (3) and the detaching rolls (6'') are moved during a combing cycle towards one another and away from one another by the distance of a stroke path, up to a minimum distance which corresponds to a predetermined separation value. While still maintaining the stroke path, the predetermined separation distance (ecartement value) can be adjusted. To facilitate the setting of the ecartement value, provision is made for bearings (41) of the detaching rolls (6'') to be displaced relative to the fixed bearing (2) of the nipper head (3), jointly on a track (45) which enlarges or reduces the separation value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 19/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/20 (2006.01); D01G 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/26 (2013.01); D01G 19/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB GR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 5546636 A 19960820; AT 194669 T 20000715; DE 59605567 D1 20000817; EP 0735167 A2 19961002; EP 0735167 A3 19970312; EP 0735167 B1 20000712; GR 3034303 T3 20001229

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050217

2002-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020217

2001-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-10-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010217

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010322

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010217

2000-10-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000925

2000-10-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605567 20000817

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB GR IT LI

2000-07-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194669 T 20000715

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHN D. HOLLINGSWORTH ON WHEELS, INC.

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991005

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970826

1997-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOLLINGSWORTH SACO LOWELL, INC.

1997-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MANDL, GERHARD, DR.

1997-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MEILE, HANS-PETER

1997-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB GR IT LI

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB GR IT LI