Global Patent Index - EP 0735170 B1

EP 0735170 B1 2001-05-30 - Method for improving the weft inserting performance in an air jet loom and inserting nozzle for carrying out the method

Title (en)

Method for improving the weft inserting performance in an air jet loom and inserting nozzle for carrying out the method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Leistungssteigerung beim Schussfadeneintrag in ein Webfach einer Luftdüsenwebmaschine und Eintragsdüse zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé d'augmentation de la capacité d'insertion de trame d'un métier à air et tuyère pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0735170 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101390 A

Priority

DE 19511439 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19511439C1] To increase the productivity of a jet loom, with weft insertion through an air jet, the air stream expansion with pick-up of the weft occurs before the air stream enters the mixing tube, which is on an extension of the yarn guide tube within the jet assembly. Pref. the air stream expansion is at the outlet end section of the yarn guide tube, and it increases continuously up to the transfer into the mixing tube. The cross section surface of the notches (11) or openings increases towards the outlet end surface of the yarn guide tube (3). The notches (11) are formed as a nick in the yarn guide tube (3). The openings in the yarn guide tube (3) are drillings.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/16 (2006.01); B65H 54/86 (2006.01); D03D 47/00 (2006.01); D03D 47/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/3013 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19511439 C1 19960314; EP 0735170 A1 19961002; EP 0735170 B1 20010530; JP 2635954 B2 19970730; JP H0921035 A 19970121; US 5697405 A 19971216

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606975

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606975

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-01-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-08-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DIPL.-ING. ETH H. R. WERFFELI PATENTANWALT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606975 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981001

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970213

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI