Global Patent Index - EP 0735187 B1

EP 0735187 B1 2001-12-05 - A sheet of cellulosic fibers

Title (en)

A sheet of cellulosic fibers

Title (de)

Ein Blatt aus Zellulosefasern

Title (fr)

Une feuille de fibres cellulosiques

Publication

EP 0735187 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96302098 A

Priority

US 41291495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735187A1] Fire-resistant, paper-like sheet material (10) is provided in the form of pressed cellulosic fibers (20) containing dispersed particles of intercalated graphite (30). At least a portion of the surface area of the sheet (10) is in the form of exposed intercalated graphite (300). The sheet (10) may also contain a thermosetting resin e.g. a water soluble phenolic resin, a portion of which is exposed at the surface of the sheet (10) in the form of flattened globules (400) such that the sheet (10) can be bonded by said resin (400) to a contacting surface (510). The sheet material (10) can be applied to flammable articles, such as wood products (500) used in construction, to impact fire-resistance to these articles. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/67; D21H 27/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B32B 5/22 (2006.01); B32B 21/12 (2006.01); D06M 23/08 (2006.01); D21H 13/50 (2006.01); D21H 17/67 (2006.01); D21H 21/34 (2006.01); D21H 27/22 (2006.01); B29K 1/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/00 (2006.01); D06M 101/02 (2006.01); D06M 101/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 27/22 (2013.01); D21H 13/50 (2013.01); D21H 21/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735187 A1 19961002; EP 0735187 B1 20011205; AU 5034696 A 19961010; AU 700061 B2 19981217; CA 2172878 A1 19960930; CA 2172878 C 20020528; DE 69617506 D1 20020117; DE 69617506 T2 20020516; JP 3034793 B2 20000417; JP H0931887 A 19970204; NO 961219 A 19960930; NO 961219 D0 19960326

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110327

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69617506

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110327

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110327

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100330

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-05-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: UCAR CARBON TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION

2002-03-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69617506 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990312

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970324

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT