Global Patent Index - EP 0735232 B1

EP 0735232 B1 2000-12-13 - Cutter bit for use in drilling operations

Title (en)

Cutter bit for use in drilling operations

Title (de)

Bohrmeissel für Bohrvorgänge

Title (fr)

Outil de coupe pour opérations de forage

Publication

EP 0735232 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95302012 A

Priority

EP 95302012 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735232A1] Disclosed is a cutter bit (1) for use in drilling operations comprising a body (10) having a top portion (11) and a bottom portion (12), the bottom portion (12) being provided with cutting means for cutting a formation to which the cutting means is exposed. Within an outer circumference (13) of the bottom portion (12) of the body (10) there is provided an opening (14) to a first passage (15) through the body (10) to communicate a first zone (20) of a hole located below the bottom portion (12) of the body (10) with a second zone of the hole located above the bottom portion (12) of the body (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 10/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 10/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735232 A1 19961002; EP 0735232 B1 20001213; DE 69519625 D1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-03-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-13 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010313

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519625 20010118

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990507

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970327

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK FR GB IT NL SE