Global Patent Index - EP 0735233 A3

EP 0735233 A3 2000-06-28 - Hydraulically actuated sleeve valve for wells

Title (en)

Hydraulically actuated sleeve valve for wells

Title (de)

Hydraulisch betätigtes Muffenventil für Erdbohrungen

Title (fr)

Obturateur à manchon actionné hydrauliquement pour puits

Publication

EP 0735233 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96104393 A

Priority

DE 19511722 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735233A2] The sleeve valve is installed in a tube string to connect its internal and external volumes. The significant novel feature here, is hydraulic actuation. In the new design the outer body (1) contains an integrated hydraulic unit (2). There is a piston (6) moving in seals (3) located on the hydraulic unit. These are set above and below the circulation openings (10) i.e. the slide valve ports. They also bound the cylindrical cavity (14), above and below. At the upper and lower ends of the cavity (14), there are passages (12, 13) for hydraulic fluid conducted through the hydraulic connections (7, 8). Seals (4) are also fastened to the piston enlargement (15), separating the cavity into two sealed chambers. The circulation ports through the piston (6) and outer body (1) are sealed from these.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 34/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 34/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 34/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735233 A2 19961002; EP 0735233 A3 20000628; EP 0735233 B1 20030219; DE 19511722 A1 19961002; DE 19511722 C2 19970417; DK 0735233 T3 20030505

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-04-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160319

2016-03-23 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-03-21 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-03-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59610142

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-06-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610142 P 20030327

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB NL

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB NL

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK GB NL