Global Patent Index - EP 0735267 B1

EP 0735267 B1 2000-05-03 - Mounting device of an injection nozzle in particular on the cylinder head of an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Mounting device of an injection nozzle in particular on the cylinder head of an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung einer Einspritzdüse insbesondere am Zylinderkopf einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un injecteur en particulier sur la culasse de cylindre d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0735267 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101575 A

Priority

DE 19511703 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735267A2] The device has a flange (4), with an aperture, formed by an angled section (7), open on one side, for corresponding stop faces (8) on the injection nozzle (2). The flange acts on a ring/cylinder-shaped tension/pressure sleeve (10), which is separate from the nozzle. The sleeve acts with a clamping shoulder (11) resp. spring ring (13), located separately on the outer circumference of the nozzle. The flange acts with screw bolts (5), for the fastening of a cover (14) for the cylinder head (3). The bolts have elements for noise insulation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 61/14 (2013.01); F02M 2200/855 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735267 A2 19961002; EP 0735267 A3 19961106; EP 0735267 B1 20000503; DE 19511703 A1 19961002; ES 2146331 T3 20000801; JP 3761624 B2 20060329; JP H08270531 A 19961015

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160204

2016-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160526

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160202

2016-02-03 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605097

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150304

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146331 T3

2000-07-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605097 20000608

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981103

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970418

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT