Global Patent Index - EP 0735275 B1

EP 0735275 B1 2002-09-18 - Snap-in locking device

Title (en)

Snap-in locking device

Title (de)

Rastschaltvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif à crans

Publication

EP 0735275 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100338 A

Priority

DE 19511522 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19511522C1] An actuator (10), pref. a double-acting hydraulic cylinder, is connected by delivery (24) and return (26) lines to a switching valve (28). Two releasable non-return valves (30, 32) are connected in parallel to the other non-return valves. The control line (34) of the first releasable non-return valve (30) is connected to the outlet port (44) of the second releasable non-return valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 9/02 (2006.01); F15B 11/02 (2006.01); F15B 13/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19511522 C1 19960718; AT 224510 T 20021015; EP 0735275 A2 19961002; EP 0735275 A3 19980422; EP 0735275 B1 20020918; JP H08320001 A 19961203; US 5699714 A 19971223

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070111

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060112

2006-01-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060111

2006-01-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060111

2005-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609666 20021024

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224510 T 20021015

2002-05-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDAC FLUIDTECHNIK GMBH

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000712

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980514

1998-04-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE