Global Patent Index - EP 0735320 B1

EP 0735320 B1 2000-10-11 - Process and device for purification of noxious exhaust gases by chemical conversion

Title (en)

Process and device for purification of noxious exhaust gases by chemical conversion

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Reinigung von schadstoffhaltigen Abgasen durch chemische Umsetzung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la purification des effluents gazeux nocifs par conversion chimique

Publication

EP 0735320 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102121 A

Priority

DE 19511643 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735320A2] The method cleans waste gases with toxic substances esp. from CVD and plasma processes. The cleaning is carried out in a combustion chamber with a burner to generate a combustion gas flame. the flame serves to heat and/or chemically convert the toxic substance. The surfaces of the chamber and/or surfaces brought into the chamber are covered with a porous layer of silicon. The waste gas with the toxic substance is heated in the chamber and is guided along the surfaces in question. The porous silicon dioxide layer is cut away by thermal oxidation of silane or another silicon gas following purification phases in the chamber. The secondary, fluid toxic substance e.g. silicon fluoride, formed from the chemical reaction of the fluoride toxic substance with the hot silicon dioxide is hydrolysed using absorption and may also be neutralised.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 7/06; F23J 15/04; F23M 5/00; F23M 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/06 (2006.01); F23J 15/04 (2006.01); F23M 5/00 (2006.01); F23M 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 9/06 (2013.01); F23G 7/065 (2013.01); F23J 15/04 (2013.01); F23M 5/00 (2013.01); F23G 2209/142 (2013.01); F23J 2215/30 (2013.01); F23J 2219/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735320 A2 19961002; EP 0735320 A3 19970326; EP 0735320 B1 20001011; DE 19511643 A1 19961002

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030902

2002-12-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-02 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-04-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DUNNSCHICHT ANLAGEN SYSTEME G.M.B.H. DRESDEN DAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010215

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605974

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-16

2000-11-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2000-10-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-10-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001011

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990608

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970423

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL