Global Patent Index - EP 0735321 B1

EP 0735321 B1 2000-04-12 - Process for purification of noxious exhaust gases by chemical conversion

Title (en)

Process for purification of noxious exhaust gases by chemical conversion

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reinigung von schadstoffhaltigen Abgasen durch chemische Umsetzung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la purification des effluents gazeux nocifs par conversion chimique

Publication

EP 0735321 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102122 A

Priority

DE 19511644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735321A2] The device cleans or purifies waste gas containing toxic substances esp. with fluoride carbonated water etc. The method uses chemical conversion in a combustion chamber with a burner for generating a burning gas flame. By spatial separation of the feeding in of gases of different combinations and quantities into the flame a flame region of reduced chemical strength is created. The gas to be cleaned is fed into this region. A strongly oxidised flame region is also formed. The gas is put into this region and then it is passed through the reduced region. The appts. for carrying out this method has a combustion chamber, a ring burner for the burning gas or gas mixture, and a central supply for the toxic waste gas into the burner. One or more inlet channels are arranged in the wall of the chamber near the burner to additionally feed in air or acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 7/06; F23G 5/14; F23J 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/065 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 8601131 A1 19860227 - AMERICAN COMBUSTION INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735321 A2 19961002; EP 0735321 A3 19970326; EP 0735321 B1 20000412; DE 19511644 A1 19961002

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59604931

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140424

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-02-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050214

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-02-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-06-26 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20020202

2002-02-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-06 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PURIFICATION OF NOXIOUS EXHAUST GASES BY CHEMICAL CONVERSION

2002-01-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-16 [RTI2] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PURIFICATION OF NOXIOUS EXHAUST GASES BY CHEMICAL CONVERSION

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DUNNSCHICHT ANLAGEN SYSTEME G.M.B.H. DRESDEN DAS

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-03-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CENTROTHERM ELEKTRISCHE ANLAGEN GMBH & CO.

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000703

2000-07-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604931 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2000-04-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

1999-10-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROCESS FOR PURIFICATION OF NOXIOUS EXHAUST GASES BY CHEMICAL CONVERSION

1999-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990604

1997-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970429

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL