Global Patent Index - EP 0735322 B1

EP 0735322 B1 2000-10-18 - Process and device for purification of noxious exhaust gases by chemical conversion in a flame and hot surfaces

Title (en)

Process and device for purification of noxious exhaust gases by chemical conversion in a flame and hot surfaces

Title (de)

Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Reinigung von schadstoffhaltigen Abgasen durch chemische Umsetzung in einer Flamme und an heissen Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la purification des effluents gazeux nocifs par conversion chimique dans une flamme et sur des surfaces chaudes

Publication

EP 0735322 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102123 A

Priority

DE 19511645 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735322A2] Process for removing impurities, esp. fluorine cpds., from non-combustible waste gases in a combustion chamber has a burner gas flame which heats and/or chemically reacts the impurities and a unit for treating the hot gas stream from the burner gas flame. The process is novel in that a body or material which lets the hot gas stream through and which has a large internal surface is arranged in the hot gas flow inside the combustion chamber and heat-insulated from the combustion chamber casing and in this way is heated to above 500 degrees C, pref. 700-1400 degrees C. The gas passes through this body or material and contacts the inside surfaces of the same. The body or material is made of a material or material mixt. which forms volatile cpds. and/or causes additional activation and/or is catalytically active with one of the primary impurity and/or the secondary substance of the combustion. The hot gas stream leaving the body or material passes into a single or multi-stage unit at the exit of t he combustion chamber for further treatment and then after cleaning is passed into the exhaust air. Also claimed is the appts. for carrying out the above process having a burner gas flame (7) novel in that a large grain granulate, a sintered body or a number of sintered bodies, for example, in the form of a ring or, or in the case when silicon dioxide is used, also fused tubes are included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 7/06; F23J 15/02; F23J 15/04; F23M 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/06 (2006.01); F23J 15/02 (2006.01); F23J 15/04 (2006.01); F23M 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 9/06 (2013.01); F23G 7/065 (2013.01); F23J 15/02 (2013.01); F23J 15/04 (2013.01); F23G 2209/142 (2013.01); F23J 2215/30 (2013.01); F23J 2219/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735322 A2 19961002; EP 0735322 A3 19970423; EP 0735322 B1 20001018; DE 19511645 A1 19961002

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2003-11-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030214

2002-02-21 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: DAS-DUNNSCHICHT ANLAGEN SYSTEME G.M.B.H. DRESDEN

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605997 20001123

2000-11-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2000-10-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990301

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970423

1997-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL