Global Patent Index - EP 0735324 B1

EP 0735324 B1 2000-07-12 - Simplified oven door with removable module

Title (en)

Simplified oven door with removable module

Title (de)

Vereinfachte Ofentür mit abnehmbaren Modul

Title (fr)

Porte de four simplifiée avec module amovible

Publication

EP 0735324 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420094 A

Priority

FR 9503743 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735324A1] The door (1) consists of a frame, an inner panel (5) and an outer panel (10), and has a ventilation system to create an air flow between the two panels to lower the temperature of the outer panel while the oven is in use. The inner panel is made from glass, and the outer one, which is detachable, is made from a plastic which is resistant to the temperatures encountered during cooking, preferably a polycarbonate moulded in one piece. The frame of the door comprises two lateral uprights (2) which fit over the edges of the inner panel, with the outer panel connected to the uprights by ball and socket fixings (4), the sockets being moulded as part of the outer panel and flexing to accommodate the balls. The ventilation is provided by apertures (13) in the upper edge of the outer panel to promote a natural convection between the panels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES GB GR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735324 A1 19961002; EP 0735324 B1 20000712; DE 69609223 D1 20000817; DE 69609223 T2 20010308; DK 0735324 T3 20001023; ES 2148711 T3 20001016; FR 2732097 A1 19960927; FR 2732097 B1 19970523; GR 3034557 T3 20010131; US 5928540 A 19990727

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160321

2016-06-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160627

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-04-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160319

2016-03-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69609223

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150316

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 20

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20071001

2006-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-10-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041006

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2003-03-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030311

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-10-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148711

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MAROSCIA & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609223

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-17

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES GB GR IT NL

1998-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971219

1996-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961001

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES GB GR IT NL