Global Patent Index - EP 0735334 B1

EP 0735334 B1 2001-12-12 - Installation for the production of bricks and/or of rooftiles

Title (en)

Installation for the production of bricks and/or of rooftiles

Title (de)

Anlage zur Herstellung von Ziegeln und/oder Dachpfannen

Title (fr)

Installation pour la production de briques et/ou de tuiles

Publication

EP 0735334 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104671 A

Priority

DE 19511093 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735334A1] The plant has separate circular tunnels for drying (16) and firing (17) material which is transported around circular tracks (15,18). The tunnels run concentrically, and are arranged close to one another, and each tunnel has an open sector in order to form a loading and unloading point. The tunnels surround a material store (M), which is in the form of a round sump or mixing bed. The plant can be housed in a shed whose plan is in the shape of a circle or a polygon, and processed material can be deposited in an annular mound by a conveyor belt (7), and can be extracted by rotating equipment (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 1/00; F27B 9/02; F27B 9/16; F27B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 15/00 (2006.01); F27B 9/02 (2006.01); F27B 9/16 (2006.01); F27D 3/00 (2006.01); F27B 1/00 (2006.01); F27B 9/30 (2006.01); F27B 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 9/02 (2013.01); B28B 15/00 (2013.01); F27B 9/16 (2013.01); F27D 3/0021 (2013.01); F27D 3/0033 (2013.01); F27B 1/00 (2013.01); F27B 19/04 (2013.01); F27B 2009/3088 (2013.01); F27D 2003/0059 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735334 A1 19961002; EP 0735334 B1 20011212; AT 210809 T 20011215; DE 19511093 C1 19961010

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-08-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KELLER H.C.W. GMBH

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020325

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608405 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210809 T 20011215

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KELLER GMBH

2001-08-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KELLER H.C.W. GMBH

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990408

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960925

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB GR IT PT

1996-10-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI

1996-10-02 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI