Global patent index - EP 0735342 B1

EP 0735342 B1 2000-01-12 - MUNITION TO SELF-PROTECT A TANK

Title (en)

MUNITION TO SELF-PROTECT A TANK

Title (de)

MUNITIONSEINHEIT ZUM SELBSTSCHUTZ FÜR EINEN PANZER

Title (fr)

MUNITION POUR L'AUTODEFENSE D'UN CHAR DE COMBAT

Publication

EP 0735342 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95909570 A

Priority

RU 9400217 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9608690A1] The invention relates to the domain of projectiles with warheads comprising an outer casing with machined notches to ensure even fragmentation, or containing a plurality of individual sub-projectiles, and can be used for defending vehicles, particularly tanks. The proposed round comprises a protective projectile with a casing which is preferably box-shaped and with an explosive charge in the form of a rectangular bi-concave lens, the face portion of which is covered by a bullet-forming shell which tapers towards the bottom section and is provided with notches forming mutually reinforcing fins in the shape of a pyramid. A groove with a wedge fin is provided on the projectile casing. The round also has a case containing a propellant charge, a wire communications line and a barrel container. The incoming projectile is destroyed in the immediate vicinity of the defended object. Shoot down and detonation commands are passed from a self-defence control system down the communications line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/22 (2006.01); F42B 12/24 (2006.01); F42B 12/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9608690 A1 19960321; DE 69422639 D1 20000217; DE 69422639 T2 20000831; EP 0735342 A1 19961002; EP 0735342 A4 19960918; EP 0735342 B1 20000112; RU 2127861 C1 19990320

INPADOC legal status

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-07-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-06-03 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020915

2002-09-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020915

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010928

- Year of fee payment: 08

2001-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010914

- Year of fee payment: 08

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-06-05 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2000-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69422639

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-01-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-01-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-09-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: MUNITION TO SELF-PROTECT A TANK

1997-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970206

1996-10-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960523

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-09-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1996-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE