Global Patent Index - EP 0735412 B1

EP 0735412 B1 2000-08-16 - Process of preparing a monodispersed tabular silver halide grain emulsion

Title (en)

Process of preparing a monodispersed tabular silver halide grain emulsion

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Emulsionen mit monodispersen Silberhalogenidtafelkörnen

Title (fr)

Procédé de préparation d'un émulsion à grain tabulaire à l'halugénure d'argent monodisperse

Publication

EP 0735412 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95104628 A

Priority

EP 95104628 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735412A1] The present invention relates to a process for preparing tabular silver halide grain emulsions, said process comprising the following steps: (a) forming a population of silver halide nuclei in a dispersing medium, (b) ripening said population of silver halide nuclei, and (c) growing said population of silver halide nuclei to form tabular silver halide grains, characterized in that a polyalkylene oxide-polyalkylsiloxane copolymer is added during at least one of said steps (a), (b), and (c). The presence of the polyalkylene oxide-polyalkylsiloxane copolymer during tabular silver halide grain formation enable the growth of tabular silver halide grain emulsions having a reduced amount of non-conforming grains and a lower coefficient of variation (COV).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/005; G03C 1/043; G03C 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/015 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/043 (2006.01); G03C 1/06 (2006.01); G03C 1/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/07 (2013.01); G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/043 (2013.01); G03C 1/015 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. G03C 1/07 + G03C 1/043
  2. G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2001/0055 + G03C 2001/0357

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735412 A1 19961002; EP 0735412 B1 20000816; JP H08272016 A 19961018

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2003-03-03 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030303

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR IT

2000-07-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-03-16 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-02-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): FR IT

1999-12-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY

1997-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970919

1997-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970319

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR IT