Global Patent Index - EP 0735629 B1

EP 0735629 B1 2000-07-26 - Arrangement for the connection of electrical wire conductors and especially connection module equipped with such an arrangement

Title (en)

Arrangement for the connection of electrical wire conductors and especially connection module equipped with such an arrangement

Title (de)

Vorrichtung für die Verbindung von elektrischen Leitungsdrähten und Anschlussblock ausgerüstet mit obiger Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Agencement de connexion pour fils conducteurs électriques et module, notamment de type bloc de jonction, équipé d'un tel agencement

Publication

EP 0735629 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400635 A

Priority

FR 9503707 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735629A1] The device includes a conducting plate (3) which is made of a rigid material with a flat connecting element (30). It has along an edge support pieces (31) of rectangular cross-section which plug into a rectangular hole (21) at one end of a sprung strip and make contact with the other end of the strip. The support has an flange (32) which acts as an abutment after insertion and as a guide for connecting wires. A shunting element (38) allows connection to an additional external interconnector. A casing (1) has complementary cavities (11, 12) to the connecting element which lies parallel to the principal surface (102) of the casing. Wires are introduced by pushing into a channel (17) in the casing and the corresponding hole.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 31/08; H01R 9/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/48 (2006.01); H01R 9/26 (2006.01); H01R 31/02 (2006.01); H01R 31/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/2675 (2013.01); H01R 31/085 (2013.01); H01R 4/4845 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735629 A1 19961002; EP 0735629 B1 20000726; BR 9601174 A 19980106; CA 2172919 A1 19960930; CA 2172919 C 20040427; ES 2148697 T3 20001016; FR 2732518 A1 19961004; FR 2732518 B1 19970430; JP H08287977 A 19961101; US 5853304 A 19981229

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150326

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100327

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100326

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100326

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *ENTRELEC

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090218

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148697 T3

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES GB IT NL

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981126

1997-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961205

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE ES GB IT NL