Global Patent Index - EP 0735672 B1

EP 0735672 B1 2002-11-27 - Dual surface acoustic wave transducer for dual filter, in particular for television receivers

Title (en)

Dual surface acoustic wave transducer for dual filter, in particular for television receivers

Title (de)

Oberflächenwellen-Doppelwandler für ein Doppelfilter, insbesondere für Fernsehempfangsgeräte

Title (fr)

Transducteur double à ondes acoustiques de surface pour filtre double, notamment pour récepteurs de télévision

Publication

EP 0735672 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104184 A

Priority

DE 19512251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0735672A2] The surface wave convertor has an interdigital structure of piezoelectric material (1). This structure has components (31,32,32') with convertor fingers which have partial interdigital overlapping. A part structure of a first component (31) has known interdigital overlapping (61) between two first ranges (b,c/b',c'). At least one other component (32,32') has finger overlappings (62,63;62',63') of these first ranges with convertor fingers of another range (a;a'). This other range (a;a') can be positioned to the side, between the two first ranges (b,b'/c,c). At least one further range (d;e) with convertor fingers, is positioned to the side of one of the first ranges and has interdigital finger overlapping (42,43) with these fingers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H03H 9/64; H03H 9/145

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H03H 9/145 (2006.01); H03H 9/00 (2006.01); H03H 9/64 (2006.01); H03H 9/72 (2006.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/44 (2013.01); H03H 9/1452 (2013.01); H03H 9/6426 (2013.01); H03H 9/72 (2013.01); H03H 2250/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0735672 A2 19961002; EP 0735672 A3 19970205; EP 0735672 B1 20021127; CA 2173055 A1 19961001; DE 19512251 A1 19961010; DE 19512251 C2 19970403; JP 3806178 B2 20060809; JP H08288784 A 19961101; KR 100425398 B1 20040616; US 5867075 A 19990202

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160314

2016-04-06 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160314

2016-03-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609896

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EPCOS AG

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609896 20030109

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPCOS AG

1999-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991015

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970703

1997-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

1996-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI