Global Patent Index - EP 0735832 B1

EP 0735832 B1 2000-07-19 - APPLICATOR CASE FOR SOLIDIFIED PRODUCT

Title (en)

APPLICATOR CASE FOR SOLIDIFIED PRODUCT

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER ZUM AUFTRAGEN VON FESTEN ERZEUGNISSEN

Title (fr)

ETUI APPLICATEUR POUR PRODUIT SOLIDIFIE

Publication

EP 0735832 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 94931617 A

Priority

FR 9401227 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9612421A1] The invention relates to an applicator case for solidified product comprising a tubular body (1) wherein is movably mounted a support (3) formed of a cupel (3a) intended to receive the product and of a prolongation (3b) extending opposite to the product, said support having guiding means which are in the mesh with conjugated means provided in the body and in a hollow base mounted rotationally on and with respect to said body (1) and wherein the prolongation (3b) may extend at least partially so that the rotation of the base causes the displacement of said support within the body according to a motion having at least one translation component. The case of the invention is characterized in that the conjugated means of the support (3) and of the base (2) comprise rotationally engagement and translationally guiding means (11a) while the conjugated means of the support and of the body (1) comprise conjugated screwing means (18; 8a) so that the rotation of the base causes the screwing or unscrewing of the support (3) into or out of in the body (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/04 (2013.01); A45D 2040/0062 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9612421 A1 19960502; DE 69425333 D1 20000824; DE 69425333 T2 20001228; EP 0735832 A1 19961009; EP 0735832 B1 20000719

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2005-10-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051021

2004-10-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-06-09 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031021

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2003-10-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SOC. DE CONSEILS ET D'ETUDES DES EMBALLAGES *SCEE

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-12-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021021

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LENZI & C.

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69425333 20000824

2000-08-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-07-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPLICATOR CASE FOR SOLIDIFIED PRODUCT

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981009

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960920

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT