Global Patent Index - EP 0735922 B1

EP 0735922 B1 2000-02-02 - CRUSHING MACHINE WITH ROTOR

Title (en)

CRUSHING MACHINE WITH ROTOR

Title (de)

ZERKLEINERUNGSMASCHINE MIT ROTOR

Title (fr)

MACHINE A BROYER A ROTOR

Publication

EP 0735922 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95903336 A

Priority

  • DE 4343801 A
  • EP 9404126 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: SK281237B6] A crushing machine has a rotor (2) with active and inactive wearing parts (7, 8) of which at least the inactive wearing parts (8) are made of layers (8.1, 8.4) of various composite materials. The inactive wearing parts (8) are formed by a cover face (8.1) and a support (8.2, 8.3) and a jacket (1) is subdivided radially and axially by the cover faces (8.1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 13/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 13/28 (2013.01); B02C 2013/2808 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4343801 A1 19950629; AT 189410 T 20000215; AU 1243195 A 19950710; CZ 283832 B6 19980617; CZ 9602164 A3 19970611; DK 0735922 T3 20000501; EP 0735922 A1 19961009; EP 0735922 B1 20000202; ES 2141917 T3 20000401; GR 3032622 T3 20000531; GR 970300001 T1 19970228; SK 281237 B6 20010118; SK 95496 A3 19970205; US 6042035 A 20000328; WO 9517255 A1 19950629

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131213

2015-08-28 [REG DE R040] WITHDRAWAL/REFUSAL OF REVOCATION ACTION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R040

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-28 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20141214

2015-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141104

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-12-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-12-13 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131213

2014-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131213

2014-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140702

2014-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2014-10-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-09-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20000400291

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20140702

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131214

2014-08-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131213

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131213

2014-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 189410

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131213

2014-07-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-07-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *METSO LINDEMANN G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131203

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-01-02 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R039

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131015

2013-10-15 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R008

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121214

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-06-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-05-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2141917

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409131

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LU NL SE

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189410

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-09-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SVEDALA LINDEMANN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971008

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960619

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LU NL SE