Global Patent Index - EP 0735931 B1

EP 0735931 B1 2000-11-29 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TWIN BELT CASTING

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TWIN BELT CASTING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DOPPELBANDGIESSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COULAGE A BANDES JUMELEES

Publication

EP 0735931 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95907962 A

Priority

  • US 9414993 W
  • US 17336993 A
  • US 17366393 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9517274A1] An apparatus and method for strip casting of metals on at least one endless belt (12) whereby the belt is cooled by cooling means (32) when it is not in contact with molten metal deposited on its surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06; B22D 11/128

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0605 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9517274 A1 19950629; AU 1860495 A 19950710; AU 692236 B2 19980604; BR 9408373 A 19970819; CA 2178587 A1 19950629; DE 69426362 D1 20010104; DE 69426362 T2 20010405; DK 0735931 T3 20010122; EP 0735931 A1 19961009; EP 0735931 A4 19981104; EP 0735931 B1 20001129; ES 2151953 T3 20010116; JP 3497170 B2 20040216; JP H09507793 A 19970812

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2011-03-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110330

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALCOA INC.

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-07-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080102

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081215

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-08-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-10-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: ALCOA INC.

- Free text: ALCOA INC.#ALCOA CORPORATE CENTER, 201 ISABELLA STREET#PITTSBURGH, PA 15212-5858 (US) -TRANSFER TO- ALCOA INC.#ALCOA CORPORATE CENTER, 201 ISABELLA STREET#PITTSBURGH, PA 15212-5858 (US)

2006-11-08 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151953 T3

2001-01-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426362 20010104

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCOA INC.

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990222

1998-11-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980918

1998-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960723

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL