Global patent index - EP 0735935 B1

EP 0735935 B1 2000-04-05 - IMPULSE DRIVE SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY FOR AN IMPULSE SCREWDRIVER

Title (en)

IMPULSE DRIVE SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY FOR AN IMPULSE SCREWDRIVER

Title (de)

IMPULSSCHLAGWERK, INSBESONDERE FÜR IMPULSSCHRAUBER

Title (fr)

SYSTEME A IMPULSIONS OPERANT PAR CHOC, EN PARTICULIER POUR UN TOURNEVIS A IMPULSIONS

Publication

EP 0735935 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95902761 A

Priority

  • DE 9401484 W
  • DE 4343582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5735354A] PCT No. PCT/DE94/01484 Sec. 371 Date Sep. 16, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Sep. 16, 1996 PCT Filed Dec. 14, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/17281 PCT Pub. Date Jun. 29, 1995The pulse impact mechanism (12) has a rotation element (13), joined to a driving shaft (14), in which a receiving opening (16) for a core (17) is configured concentrically with the rotation axis (15). The core part (17) is joined in rotational engagement with a driven shaft (25). In addition, rotation element (13) has a radial bore (18), extending perpendicular to the rotation axis (15), in which a reciprocating piston (19) is received in radially displaceable fashion. The reciprocating piston (19) has a through opening (20) through which core part (17) passes. The reciprocating piston constitutes, with its inner surface facing toward the core part (17), a control surface (36) that cooperates with a control track (37), with control cam (38), configured on the core part (17). When a relative rotation of rotation element (13) and core part (17) occurs, the reciprocating piston (19) executes a stroke in the radial direction. Pressure is thereby applied to a pressure medium located in a pressure chamber (40), a rotary pulse being transferred via the control surface (36) and the control track (37) to the driven shaft (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 21/02; B25B 23/145

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 21/02 (2006.01); B25B 23/145 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 21/02 (2013.01); B25B 23/1453 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP S4914839 A 19740208

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 4343582 A1 19950622; DE 59409278 D1 20000511; EP 0735935 A1 19961009; EP 0735935 B1 20000405; JP H10501180 A 19980203; US 5735354 A 19980407; WO 9517281 A1 19950629

INPADOC legal status

2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59409278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120703

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100105

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-12-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051214

2004-08-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20031214

2004-08-03 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-12-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-12-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031214

2002-12-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021202

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59409278

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1998-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971205

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960722

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE