Global patent index - EP 0736228 B1

EP 0736228 B1 2000-01-12 - POWER CONNECTION DEVICE

Title (en)

POWER CONNECTION DEVICE

Title (de)

STROMVERBINDER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONNEXION DE PUISSANCE

Publication

EP 0736228 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95935995 A

Priority

  • FR 9501390 W
  • FR 9412656 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9613078A1] A power connection device (1) comprising a socket portion (2) with a lyrate cross-section contained and held in an insulating holder (3) inside a bay so as to be accessible from one side only, as well as a plug portion (6) for insertion into the accessible side of the socket portion. The device is remarkable in that, to enable the transfer of strong currents, the socket portion consists of a thick rigid multiple clip (2) which, for connection, receives the inserted plug portion consisting of a single thick blade (6). The nip area (P) of the socket portion and the thickness (W) of the plug portion are such that the insertion force is of 1.5-5 daN, and the resultant of the contact resistances is lower than 60 mu OMEGA .

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/193

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/03 (2006.01); H01R 13/02 (2006.01); H01R 13/04 (2006.01); H01R 13/193 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/193 (2013.01); H01R 13/02 (2013.01); H01R 13/03 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9613078 A1 19960502; CA 2179290 A1 19960502; CA 2179290 C 19991012; DE 69514499 D1 20000217; DE 69514499 T2 20000531; EP 0736228 A1 19961009; EP 0736228 B1 20000112; FR 2726129 A1 19960426; FR 2726129 B1 19961122; JP 2915997 B2 19990705; JP H09503343 A 19970331; US 5997327 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151019

2015-11-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151019

2015-10-20 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69514499

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69514499

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000217

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980701

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961104

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT