Global Patent Index - EP 0736450 B1

EP 0736450 B1 2000-06-28 - Buoyancy aid for sea-going craft in distress

Title (en)

Buoyancy aid for sea-going craft in distress

Title (de)

Auftriebshilfe für Wasserfahrzeuge in Seenot

Title (fr)

Flottabilité de secours pour navires en détresse

Publication

EP 0736450 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104303 A

Priority

DE 19512753 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0736450A1] The buoyancy aid (1) has at least one folded air bag (7) on each module and a gas generator for non toxic gas. For buoyancy in an emergency the air bags are inflated via control valves (4) and with excess pressure valves (6) to prevent over inflation. The air bags are mounted in special compartments with flaps opening to the outside as the bags inflate. In the stowed position the folded bags and gas generator are protected inside an elastic cover which is ruptured when the bags are inflated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 43/12; B63B 43/14; B63G 8/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 43/12 (2006.01); B63B 43/14 (2006.01); B63G 8/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63G 8/24 (2013.01); B63B 43/12 (2013.01); B63B 43/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0736450 A1 19961009; EP 0736450 B1 20000628; DE 19512753 A1 19961010; TR 9600245 A2 19961221

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080319

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080319

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080319

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-05-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605477 20000803

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981007

1998-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO.

1996-10-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960727

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT