Global Patent Index - EP 0736451 B1

EP 0736451 B1 2000-06-07 - Arrangement for the adjustment or reduction of the wind pressure on a sail

Title (en)

Arrangement for the adjustment or reduction of the wind pressure on a sail

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Regulierung bzw. Minderung des Winddrucks auf ein Segel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le réglage ou la réduction de la pression du vent sur une voile

Publication

EP 0736451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105044 A

Priority

DE 19512125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0736451A1] The tension control device is fitted into the main sheet, or the foresail sheet to control the wind pressure on the sail by extending to spill wind if the wind suddenly gusts. The sail is reset when the gust has passed. The tension control is provided by a number of parallel elastic strands (1) linking the connectors (6) to which the sheet is attached and bridged by a safety line (5) to limit the extension. The elastic lines are threaded through end caps (4) at each end of the control element, with an elastic cover (3) linking the end caps and protecting the elastic strands. The user selects the number and elasticity of the strands to provide a control characteristics to match the sail.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 9/10; B63H 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 9/06 (2006.01); B63H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 9/06 (2013.01); B63H 9/1085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0736451 A1 19961009; EP 0736451 B1 20000607; DE 19512125 A1 19961010; DK 0736451 T3 20001016; ES 2150610 T3 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060927

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-03-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050330

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-09-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030331

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-03-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030320

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-17 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030317

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-05-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020528

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020411

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150610 T3

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59603524 20001116

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-10-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI SE

2000-06-07 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-05-31 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Free text: THE ABOVE EP (UK) PATENT WAS ADVERTISED AS VOID IN THE PATENTS AND DESIGNS JOURNAL NO. 5790 DATED 3RD MAY 2000. NOTIFICATION RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE MENTION OF GRANT WAS CANCELLED.

2000-05-24 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2000-05-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MUELLER, WOLFGANG

2000-05-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RUPPRECHT, EGON

2000-05-17 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: MUELLER, WOLFGANG * RUPPRECHT, EGON

2000-05-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

2000-05-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-03-31 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

1999-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59603524 19991209

1999-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1999-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI SE

1999-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RUPPRECHT, EGON

1999-08-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MUELLER, WOLFGANG

1999-08-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUPPRECHT, EGON

1999-08-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, WOLFGANG

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980923

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961216

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI SE