Global Patent Index - EP 0736674 B1

EP 0736674 B1 2000-03-22 - Absorption member of mineral wool for acoustic insulation in an exhaust muffler, part therefor, its use, and method for producing it

Title (en)

Absorption member of mineral wool for acoustic insulation in an exhaust muffler, part therefor, its use, and method for producing it

Title (de)

Absorptionselement aus Mineralwolle für Geräuschdämpfung in einem Auspuffschalldämpfer, Bestandteil dafür, seine Verwendung und Verfahren zur Herstellung

Title (fr)

Elément d'absorption de laine minérale pour isolation acoustique dans un silencieux d'échappement, pièce pour celui-ci, son utilisation et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0736674 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96105287 A

Priority

DE 19512438 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0736674A1] An absorption member (40) is formed as a board-type shaped article, particularly a punched member, which is made up of bound mineral wool and comprises at least one recess (46) for passage of an inner pipe (22) of a muffler (2). For the case that it is not possible to slip it onto the inner pipe (22) in an axial direction, a parting slit (47) is introduced at the periphery of the recess (46) at which the recess (46) may be bent open to receive the inner pipe. It was surprisingly found that the quite considerable deformation required for this purpose nevertheless does not result in disadvantageous destructions of the material structure, apparently because the deformation distributes more or less homogeneously over the entire inner periphery of the recess (46), whereby great deformation paths may be obtained at low stress peaks. The board-type design of the absorption members comprising opposite parallel major surfaces (52) as well as its design as a punched member further contribute to good, non-destructive deformability, as its formation from a mineral wool board as a punched member ensures the overwhelming majority of fibers being oriented transversely with respect to the bending axis and thus counteracts gaping fissures. It is thereby sufficiently ensured that following its closing around the inner pipe (22), a resilient return movement of the material takes place whereby the parting slit is closed, such that any subsequent work for entirely filling the inner cavity of the muffler (2) with mineral wool is avoided. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 1/24; F01N 1/08; F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/10 (2006.01); F01N 1/08 (2006.01); F01N 1/24 (2006.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/18 (2013.01); F01N 1/084 (2013.01); F01N 1/24 (2013.01); F01N 2310/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0736674 A1 19961009; EP 0736674 B1 20000322; AT 191059 T 20000415; CZ 9600907 A3 19961016; DE 19512438 A1 19961010; HU 9600796 A2 19961028; HU 9600796 A3 20000228; HU 9600796 D0 19960528; PL 313581 A1 19961014; SI 9600111 A 19961031

INPADOC legal status


2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20000622

2001-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010201

2000-09-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-06-22 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000622

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607229 20000427

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191059 T 20000415

1998-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980108

1997-01-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961125

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE