Global Patent Index - EP 0736692 B1

EP 0736692 B1 2001-04-18 - Sealing, bearing support and driving of the rotors of a dry running screw compressor

Title (en)

Sealing, bearing support and driving of the rotors of a dry running screw compressor

Title (de)

Abdichtung, Lagerung und Antrieb der Rotoren eines trockenlaufenden Schraubenrotorverdichters

Title (fr)

Etanchéité, aménagement des paliers et entraînement des rotors d'un compresseur à vis tournant à sec

Publication

EP 0736692 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101860 A

Priority

DE 19513380 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0736692A1] The dry running rotor compressor has a sealing housing (8) with sealing discs (16) and seals (17) for each gear wheel (6, 7) between the pressure side end of the rotors (1, 2) and the bearing housing (5). Seals (10), sealing housings (14) and sealing discs (15) are between the suction side ends of the rotors (1, 2) and the bearing housing (3). The sealing discs (15, 17) are of a sintered PTFE and mica mixture or a mixture of similar characteristics.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/16; F01C 21/10; F04C 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/10 (2006.01); F04C 18/16 (2006.01); F04C 27/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/005 (2013.01); F01C 21/10 (2013.01); F04C 18/16 (2013.01); F04C 2220/12 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0736692 A1 19961009; EP 0736692 B1 20010418; DE 19513380 A1 19961010; DE 19513380 C2 19970904; JP H08284855 A 19961029; US 5695327 A 19971209

INPADOC legal status


2002-12-06 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN A.G. GHH BORSIG

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020228

2001-10-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-07-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IT SE

2001-04-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG GHH BORSIG

1998-07-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GHH BORSIG TURBOMASCHINEN GMBH

1997-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971110

1996-12-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961004

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE FR GB IT SE