Global Patent Index - EP 0736823 A3

EP 0736823 A3 2000-01-26 - Hand-setting device for a watch

Title (en)

Hand-setting device for a watch

Title (de)

Zeigerverstellvorrichtung für ein Uhrwerk

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mise à l'heure pour montre

Publication

EP 0736823 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 96101793 A

Priority

DE 19512680 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19512680C1] The setting device has a manually-operated setting knob (12) displaced between at least 2 axial positions relative to the timepiece housing (10), with an attached cog (16) cooperating with cogwheel (18) for setting the timepiece hands in one of these axial positions. A spring-biased switch sleeve (20) fits between the setting knob and the bearing pin (14) supporting the setting knob, the bias spring (22) biasing the setting knob into the released axial position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 27/00; G04B 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19512680 C1 19960404; EP 0736823 A2 19961009; EP 0736823 A3 20000126

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040511

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 04B 27/00 A, 7G 04B 3/04 B

1999-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRAUN GMBH

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI