Global Patent Index - EP 0736924 B1

EP 0736924 B1 2002-09-04 - Portable receiver with an antenna

Title (en)

Portable receiver with an antenna

Title (de)

Tragbarer Empfänger mit einer Antenne

Title (fr)

Récepteur portable muni d'une antenne

Publication

EP 0736924 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96200856 A

Priority

FR 9504041 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0736924A1] The receiver is mounted in a flat case which contains an LCD flat TV screen (20) with an RF integrated circuit mounted behind. Two electrically conductive lid sections (4,5), one on either side of the box, swing on pivots (6,7) to form an antenna when opened. The lids sections are parallel to the screen and are opened to provide good screen viewing. A fixed triangular antenna section lies over the top of the circuit and forms a yagi array which provides connection to the integrated circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/22; H01Q 9/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 3/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/22 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 9/28 (2006.01); H04B 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/28 (2013.01); H01Q 1/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0736924 A1 19961009; EP 0736924 B1 20020904; DE 69623373 D1 20021010; DE 69623373 T2 20030605; JP H08288728 A 19961101; US 5739795 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060328

2005-05-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050517

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69623373 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE GRAND PUBLIC

1998-08-26 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1997-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS ELECTRONIQUE GRAND PUBLIC

1997-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970409

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB