Global Patent Index - EP 0737091 B9

EP 0737091 B9 2002-11-13 - FILTER INSERT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

FILTER INSERT AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

FILTEREINSATZ UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

CARTOUCHE DE FILTRE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 0737091 B9 (DE)

Application

EP 95905028 A

Priority

  • DE 9401558 W
  • DE 4345121 A
  • DE 4447365 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9517943A2] A filter insert (1A) for a fluid filter with an outer square or hollow cylindrical shape has a plurality of continuous zigzag folded walls (5) made of a fluid-permeable material (2) and provided in the plane of at least part of the folded walls with stiffening embossed depressions (3) and/or projections for keeping the walls folded. The depressions and/or projections of adjacent folded walls are interconnected at least in part and supported on each other. Stiff spacers are provided between the depressions or projections in at least part of their length for interconnecting them and supporting them on each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 29/01; B01D 29/07; B01D 29/11; B01D 29/21; B01D 29/33

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 29/07 (2006.01); B01D 29/01 (2006.01); B01D 29/11 (2006.01); B01D 29/21 (2006.01); B01D 29/33 (2006.01); B01D 46/10 (2006.01); B01D 46/24 (2006.01); B01D 46/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 46/523 (2013.01); B01D 29/012 (2013.01); B01D 29/07 (2013.01); B01D 29/111 (2013.01); B01D 29/21 (2013.01); B01D 46/10 (2013.01); B01D 46/4236 (2013.01); Y10S 55/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9517943 A2 19950706; WO 9517943 A3 19950727; AT 208225 T 20011115; AU 1381395 A 19950717; DE 59409942 D1 20011213; EP 0737091 A1 19961016; EP 0737091 B1 20011107; EP 0737091 B9 20021113; ES 2167414 T3 20020516; JP H09507156 A 19970722; US 5888262 A 19990330

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071230

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-08-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071230

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080229

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070102

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-01-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070118

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20061229

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: JACOBI SYSTEMTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167414 T3

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020213

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HUG INTERLIZENZ AG

2002-02-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020207

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409942 20011213

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 208225 T 20011115

1998-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971202

1997-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JACOBI SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960719

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE