Global patent index - EP 0737096 B2

EP 0737096 B2 2000-12-27 - USE OF A MIXING DEVICE FOR CONCHING

Title (en)

USE OF A MIXING DEVICE FOR CONCHING

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINER MISCHEINRICHTUNG ZUM CONCHIEREN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'UN MELANGEUR POUR CONCHER

Publication

EP 0737096 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 95903247 A

Priority

  • DE 9401513 W
  • DE 4344995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5707145A] PCT No. PCT/DE94/01513 Sec. 371 Date Jun. 20, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Jun. 20, 1996 PCT Filed Dec. 21, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/17951 PCT Pub. Date Jul. 6, 1995Bulk chocolate is added into a mixing apparatus whereby a plurality of conching tools (10) is fixed together with several others, on a shaft (11). The shaft (11) is rotatably mounted in end walls (21) of a horizontal drum (12). The ends of the mixing tools (10) are located a short distance from the inside wall (18) of the drum, and the shaft (11) has a drive which turns the direction of rotation of the shaft (11), the clearance between the leading edge (19) of each tool (10) and the inside wall (18) of the drum is greater than the clearance between the trailing edge (20) of the tool and the inside wall (18) of the drum. The shaft (11) is rotated to press the bulk chocolate between a bottom wall of mixing tools (10) and the inside surface of the drum (12) whereby the bulk chocolate first enters the leading edge (19) to experience a pressing force as it travels across from the leading region to the trailing region of the mixing tool (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23G 1/16 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/04 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00158 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

  • Vortrag von Rainer Schmidt an der "Schoko-Technik '89" des ZDS (Zentralfachschule der Deutschen Süsswarenwirtschaft e.V.) vom 11.12.-13.12.1989
  • FRISSE-Prospekt "Doppelüberschlag-Conche" DUC 6

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

US 5707145 A 19980113; DE 4344995 A1 19950706; EP 0737096 A1 19961016; EP 0737096 B1 19970723; EP 0737096 B2 20001227; ES 2107296 T3 19971116; JP 3019268 B2 20000313; JP H09509359 A 19970922; WO 9517951 A1 19950706

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051221

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-08-13 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20021221

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-12-21 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021221

2002-03-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011224

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-04-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010407

2001-01-17 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

- Effective date: 20001227

2001-01-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2000-12-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-12-27 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: LUECKE, ROLAND * MEYER, THOMAS * LUEKE, BERNHARD

2000-12-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-11-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEBRUEDER LOEDIGE MASCHINENBAUGESELLSCHAFT MBH -DA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2000-10-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2000-08-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: LUECKE, ROLAND, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

1999-12-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 19991214

- Year of fee payment: 6

1999-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BUEHLER AG

- Effective date: 19971022

1999-06-30 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: BUEHLER GMBH PATENTABTEILUNG

- Effective date: 19971022

1997-12-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: BUEHLER AG

- Effective date: 19971022

1997-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2107296

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

1997-10-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

1997-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59403486

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 1997-08-28

1997-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 19970723

1997-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

1997-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

1997-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1997-07-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19970723

1997-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19961129

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960627

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI