Global patent index - EP 0737144 B1

EP 0737144 B1 2000-04-05 - CARGO HATCH ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

CARGO HATCH ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

LUKENDECKELVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT POUR ECOUTILLE DE CALE

Publication

EP 0737144 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95905833 A

Priority

  • SE 9401262 W
  • SE 9304346 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9518037A1] This invention relates to arrangements at hatches and the like for openings of holds in ships. The novelty lies therein that at least some hatches are arranged as hatch elements (4) and have at least one seat (6) for receiving at least one loading platform (7) in turn arranged to carry goods and provided with locking means (8) for the detachable connection with lifting tools or the like lifting device (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 19/12; B63B 25/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/16 (2006.01); B63B 19/12 (2006.01); B63B 25/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 19/12 (2013.01); B63B 25/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9518037 A1 19950706; DE 69423913 D1 20000511; DE 69423913 T2 20001012; EP 0737144 A1 19961016; EP 0737144 B1 20000405; ES 2094709 T1 19970201; ES 2094709 T3 20000816; JP H09507187 A 19970722; PL 175835 B1 19990226; PL 315178 A1 19961014; SE 504245 C2 19961216; SE 9304346 D0 19931230; SE 9304346 L 19950701

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-12-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021229

2002-09-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-08-21 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20011228

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011228

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001218

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001215

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20001128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2094709

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-07-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423913

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL

2000-04-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000405

1998-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980525

1997-02-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: BA2A

- Ref Document Number: 2094709

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T1

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960625

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB NL