Global Patent Index - EP 0737426 B1

EP 0737426 B1 2000-03-15 - Cloth joining mechanical press

Title (en)

Cloth joining mechanical press

Title (de)

Mechanische Presse zum Verbinden von Kleidung

Title (fr)

Presse mécanique de liaison pour vêtements

Publication

EP 0737426 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95105440 A

Priority

EP 95105440 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737426A1] A cloth joining mechanical press which joins a piece of adhesive reinforcing cloth to the rear of a piece of textile fabric, and a humidifying installation which furnishes the textile fabric with moisture after the textile fabric has the reinforcing cloth joined thereto. Electromagnetic induction heaters, and electric conductive heating plates heated by them are located along a passage of work (W), which is the adhesive reinforcing cloth overlaid on the textile fabric, fed by using belts. A humidifying zone (5) is provided on the downstream side of a heating zone (4) equipped with the electromagnetic induction heaters and the heating plates, to thereby humidify the work (W) immediately after the reinforcing cloth thereof is joined to the textile fabric thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41H 43/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41H 43/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41H 43/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737426 A1 19961016; EP 0737426 B1 20000315; DE 69515636 D1 20000420

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050411

2002-12-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-04-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-16 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000616

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515636 20000420

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FIAMMENGHI - DOMENIGHETTI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1998-07-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980529

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961120

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT